LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S08589
Action History
NY
New York Senate Bill S08589
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill S08589
Action History
Senate
06/04/2024
SUBSTITUTED BY A7717B
Senate
05/29/2024
AMENDED ON THIRD READING 8589A
Senate
05/13/2024
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Senate
05/08/2024
2ND REPORT CAL.
Senate
05/07/2024
1ST REPORT CAL.947
Senate
02/16/2024
REFERRED TO JUDICIARY