Senate | 11/11/2024 | APPROVAL MEMO.12 | ||
Senate | 11/11/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.453 | ||
Senate | 11/11/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.625 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a9205a | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to higher education | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1506 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8596A | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |