Senate | 09/27/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.391 | ||
Senate | 09/20/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.111 | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | substituted for a8984 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | referred to labor | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1057 |