Senate | 10/23/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.438 | ||
Senate | 10/23/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.539 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a9359a | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | AMENDED 8607A | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1364 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |