Assembly | 05/29/2024 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1021 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |