LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S08634
Action History
NY
New York Senate Bill S08634
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill S08634
Action History
Senate
06/06/2024
SUBSTITUTED BY A9284
Senate
05/08/2024
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Senate
05/07/2024
2ND REPORT CAL.
Senate
05/06/2024
1ST REPORT CAL.872
Senate
02/23/2024
REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS