Senate | 12/21/2024 | APPROVAL MEMO.89 | ||
Senate | 12/21/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.663 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.331 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | substituted for a8846a | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1654 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8679A | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |