Assembly | 06/05/2024 | referred to codes | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1510 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/09/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8726B | ||
Senate | 05/09/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8726A | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |