Senate | 06/28/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.159 | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.269 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | substituted for a9564b | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | referred to insurance | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | AMENDED (T) 8749A | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1258 |