Assembly | 05/23/2024 | referred to education | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1145 | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8781A | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |