Assembly | 06/05/2024 | referred to transportation | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.671 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |