Senate | 12/13/2024 | VETOED MEMO.107 | ||
Senate | 12/02/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.576 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a9540 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1853 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |