Senate | 08/28/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.277 | ||
Senate | 08/20/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.186 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | substituted for a9137 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1048 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |