Assembly | 06/07/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1890 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8797B | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8797A | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | REFERRED TO LABOR |