Senate | 06/07/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | referred to transportation | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 8799B | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | AMENDED 8799A | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1365 |