Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to election law | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1217 | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO EDUCATION | ||
Senate | 04/12/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8827A | ||
Senate | 04/12/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |