Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1241 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8828A | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |