LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S08895
Action History
NY
New York Senate Bill S08895
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill S08895
Action History
Senate
06/06/2024
SUBSTITUTED BY A860
Senate
05/16/2024
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Senate
05/15/2024
2ND REPORT CAL.
Senate
05/14/2024
1ST REPORT CAL.1137
Senate
03/25/2024
REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION