Senate | 07/25/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.209 | ||
Senate | 07/25/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.509 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | substituted for a9948 | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | referred to real property taxation | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.808 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |