Assembly | 05/30/2024 | referred to local governments | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1229 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |