LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S08934
Action History
NY
New York Senate Bill S08934
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill S08934
Action History
Senate
05/08/2024
SUBSTITUTED BY A8425
Senate
04/15/2024
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Senate
04/11/2024
2ND REPORT CAL.
Senate
04/09/2024
1ST REPORT CAL.791
Senate
04/01/2024
REFERRED TO CODES