Senate | 11/11/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.454 | ||
Senate | 11/08/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.635 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a9846a | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1367 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8939A | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |