Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.936 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8949A | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | REFERRED TO LABOR |