Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A6799B | ||
Senate | 04/19/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.838 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8965A | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH |