Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A9235A | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.998 | ||
Senate | 04/12/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 8966A | ||
Senate | 04/12/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH |