Assembly | 06/03/2024 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1423 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |