Senate | 12/13/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.586 | ||
Senate | 12/02/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.638 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a9895 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1219 | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |