LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S09000
Action History
NY
New York Senate Bill S09000
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill S09000
Action History
Senate
05/28/2024
SUBSTITUTED BY A9761
Senate
04/18/2024
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Senate
04/17/2024
2ND REPORT CAL.
Senate
04/16/2024
1ST REPORT CAL.827
Senate
04/08/2024
REFERRED TO EDUCATION