Senate | 12/21/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.665 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.194 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a9478a | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to judiciary | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 9032A | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1292 |