Senate | 06/28/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.162 | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.364 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | substituted for a10111 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1525 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |