Senate | 10/23/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.439 | ||
Senate | 10/23/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.284 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | substituted for a10011 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1368 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |