Senate | 08/28/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.281 | ||
Senate | 08/20/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.359 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | substituted for a10034 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | home rule request | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | referred to transportation | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1526 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |