Senate | 09/27/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.403 | ||
Senate | 09/20/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.645 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a10027 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1591 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |