Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A10042A | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1592 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 9183B | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 9183A | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |