Assembly | 06/05/2024 | referred to racing and wagering | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1129 | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |