Senate | 09/11/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.315 | ||
Senate | 09/11/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.285 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | substituted for a10021a | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | AMENDED 9251A | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1374 | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |