Senate | 06/28/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.165 | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.460 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | substituted for a9499 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1030 | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | REFERRED TO CITIES 2 |