Senate | 08/30/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.300 | ||
Senate | 08/20/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.526 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a5564b | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | referred to transportation | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1375 |