Senate | 12/21/2024 | APPROVAL MEMO.92 | ||
Senate | 12/21/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.668 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.652 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a10234 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | AMENDED 9271A | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1434 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |