Senate | 07/25/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.210 | ||
Senate | 07/25/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.376 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | substituted for a10296 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1530 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/09/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |