Assembly | 12/13/2024 | approval memo.30 | ||
Assembly | 12/13/2024 | signed chap.560 | ||
Assembly | 12/02/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1861 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9283 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1861 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/09/2024 | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2024 | referred to health | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.350 | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2024 | print number 7516a | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2024 | amend and recommit to health |