Senate | 11/22/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.527 | ||
Senate | 11/15/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.572 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a8892 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1595 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/10/2024 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |