Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A10362B | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1786 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 9327B | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 9327A | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |