Senate | 06/05/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1788 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9349 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1788 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.217 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | rules report cal.217 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | referred to ways and means |