Senate | 07/25/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.211 | ||
Senate | 07/25/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.580 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a10224c | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1867 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 9408C | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 9408B | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES 1 | ||
Senate | 05/24/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 9408A | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |