Senate | 06/28/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.166 | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.383 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | substituted for a10404 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | referred to local governments | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1339 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |