Assembly | 06/06/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.512 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | substituted for a10103b | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 9450A | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1407 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |