Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to transportation | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 9516A | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1263 | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |