Senate | 11/22/2024 | VETOED MEMO.72 | ||
Senate | 11/15/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.662 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a10572 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1902 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 9673A | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING | ||
Senate | 05/17/2024 | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |