Senate | 08/28/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.290 | ||
Senate | 08/20/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.428 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | substituted for a10518a | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1678 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 9775A | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |